MA S2024 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2336
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow the city of Worcester to utilize video cameras to enforce certain traffic violations. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Concerning the enforcement of moving violations in the city of Worcester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2336 |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-04-09 | House | House concurred |
2012-04-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, May 1, 2012 |
2012-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-10-03 | House | House concurred |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2336 (Replaced by) 2012-07-16 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2024 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17392&generalCourtId=1 |