MA S2018 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1580
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the interest rate on tax-deferred property,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2018).
Title
Relative to the interest rate on tax-deferred property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-28 | Senate | New draft of S1580 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1580 (Replaces) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2018
H2597 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1424 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2601 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S992 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2451
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
H2597 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1424 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2601 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S992 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2451
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2018 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2018.pdf |