MA S2016 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair radius restrictions of transfer stations. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to fair radius restrictions of transfer stations
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Mark Cusack [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. William Galvin [D] |
Rep. William Driscoll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S537 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H834 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5013
H2879 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1997 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2908
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H834 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5013
H2879 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1997 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2908
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2016 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2016.pdf |