MA S1989 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1945
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Webster to issue one additional all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises of 41 Worcester Road,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 1989).
Title
Authorizing the town of Webster to issue 1 additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises of 41 Worcester road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-04-02 | House | Enacted |
2014-03-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-01-27 | Senate | New draft of S1945 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1945 (Replaces) 2014-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1989
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1989 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1989.pdf |