MA S197 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect consumers of sign language and oral interpretation and transliteration. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Protecting consumers of sign language and oral interpretation and transliteration
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] | Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S692 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1118 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S192 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H2057 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1177 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H969 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1118 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S192 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H2057 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1177 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H969 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S197 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S197.pdf |