MA S1931 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S351
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect children and families from harmful flame retardants reports the accompanying bill of the same title (Senate, No. 1931).
Title
To protect children and families from harmful flame retardants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2190 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-11-21 | Senate | New draft of S351 |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S351 (Replaces) 2013-11-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1931
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1931 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1931.pdf |