MA S1930 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3401
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - See H3401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - See H3401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Text of the Senate amendment to the House Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements (House, No. 3401) (being the text of Senate, No. 3, printed as amended).
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | See H3401 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Text of S3, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3401 (Replaced by) 2015-07-07 - Reported, in part, by H3651
H439 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H381 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H433 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H441 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4592
S1544 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S308 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
H439 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H381 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H433 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H441 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4592
S1544 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S308 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1930 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1930.pdf |