MA S1910 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for James Dupont, an employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for James Dupont, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-07-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-07-18 | House | Enacted |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-07-14 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-07-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-07-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-01 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Mean), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-05-19 | House | House concurred |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1910 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16007&generalCourtId=1 |