MA S1905 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1900
Note: Replaces legislation S1940
Note: Replaces legislation S1940
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call 41 [38-0]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call 41 [38-0]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the administration of state government and finance.
Title
To improve the administration of state government and finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call 41 [38-0] |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S1940 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Read third |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading, as amended |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Brewer) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Tarr) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #23 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #22 (Chang-Diaz) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call 40 [37-0] |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #19 (Tarr) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Richard T. Moore) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Montigny) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Rosenberg) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Rosenberg) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call 39 [39-0] |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Eldridge) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Eldridge) rejected |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Creem) adopted - Roll Call 38 [32-5] |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Michael O. Moore) adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Pending Ways and Means amendment adopted |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Read second |
2011-06-02 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2011-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with amendments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 05/24/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2011-05-16 | Senate | New draft of S1900 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1900 (Replaces) 2011-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1905
S1940 (Replaces) 2012-07-12 - Reported by S2342
S1940 (Replaces) 2012-07-12 - Reported by S2342