MA S1894 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2344
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Read second
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Read second
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assure that motorcyclists between the ages of 16 and 18 are provided with adequate education
Title
Relative to assuring that motorcyclists between the ages of 16 and 18 are provided with adequate education relative to the proper safety and operation of a motorcycle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Read second | |
2010-03-23 | New draft substituted, see S2344 | |
2010-03-23 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-23 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2344 | |
2010-02-03 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2344 (Replaced by) 2010-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S1894 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1089&generalCourtId=2 |