MA S1892 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to tax the mental health impacts of social media. Revenue.
Title
Taxing the mental health impacts of social media
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1986 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
H4647 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2785 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4897 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
H4647 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2785 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4897 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1892.pdf |