MA S1866 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Police Fire Safety Fund in the Commonwealth. . Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Creating the police fire safety equipment fund
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Sen. James Timilty [D] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] |
Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Steven Levy [R] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1866 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11815&generalCourtId=1 |