MA S1860 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4727

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the fair taxation of alcoholic beverages. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the fair taxation of alcoholic beverages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4727
2023-09-06JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4697 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2844 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback