MA S1839 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to home energy efficiency. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to home energy efficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1843 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1844 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1714 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1881 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1148 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1092 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H95 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2639 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3860
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1844 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1714 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1881 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1148 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1092 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H95 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2639 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3860
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1839 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1839.pdf |