MA S1844 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to energy efficiency funds generated by municipal lighting plants. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency funds generated by municipal lighting plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3393 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1844 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1844.pdf |