MA S1714 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase courthouse energy efficiency. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To increase courthouse energy efficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1843 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1844 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1839 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1833 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2713 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1540 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2329 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1748 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S1844 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1839 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1833 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2713 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1540 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2329 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1748 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1714 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1714.pdf |