MA S1838 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure the safety of residents, first responders, and gas workers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Ensuring the safety of residents, first responders, and gas workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1958 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S1749 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2770 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1649 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1670 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2667 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2421 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1771 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2728 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1749 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2770 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1649 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1670 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2667 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2421 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1771 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2728 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1838 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1838.pdf |