MA H2770 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4591
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allocate tax credits for projects sponsored by nonprofits to provide permanent housing for formerly homeless veterans in service-based multifamily property and projects. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to tax credits for homeless veteran housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4591 |
2017-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/17 from 2:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 & B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1665 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3319 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3669
S1651 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1657 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S1517 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1591 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1519 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1536 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3779 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4591 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3319 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3669
S1651 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1657 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S1517 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1591 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1519 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1536 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3779 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4591 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2770 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2770.pdf |