MA H1670 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Commonwealth building projects. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Commonwealth building projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1372 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1756 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1743 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1838 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S296 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H1649 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1317 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1756 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1743 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1838 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S296 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H1649 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1317 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1670 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1670.pdf |