MA S1836 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a bifurcated property tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to a bifurcated property tax
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2743 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
S1867 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1844 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3734 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Amendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
S1851 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1812 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H2933 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2935 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
S1867 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1844 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3734 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Amendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
S1851 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1812 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H2933 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2935 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1836 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1836.pdf |