MA S1831 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to neighborhood stabilization and economic development. Revenue.
Title
Relative to neighborhood stabilization and economic development
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H281 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1826 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1826 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1831 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1831.pdf |