MA S182 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2318

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to credit and debit cards. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to credit and debit cards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2318
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2015-12-07HouseHouse concurred
2015-12-03SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
2015-09-02JointHearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S129 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S135 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1601 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1531 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2697 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback