MA S1690 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Pending: Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Pending: Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation regarding mixed use redevelopment of state pier to enhance economic development of the New Bedford waterfront and downtown. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
For a mixed use redevelopment of state pier to enhance economic development of the New Bedford waterfront and downtown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1522 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S336 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2289
S1058 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
S2215 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S224
S2289 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S2529
S1448 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2008 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Placed on file
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S336 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2289
S1058 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
S2215 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S224
S2289 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S2529
S1448 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2008 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Placed on file
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1690 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1690.pdf |