MA S336 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2289

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote global trade and economic development through dual language and bi-literacy. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote global trade and economic development through bi-literacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2289
2016-04-28SenateSenate concurred
2016-04-21HouseReporting date extended to Friday, May 6, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-16HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2289 (Replaced by) 2017-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S2529
S270 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1522 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S214 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S215 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback