MA S270 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2341
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to school transportation. Education.
Title
Relative to school transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] |
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2341 |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2341 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S1822 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2249 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 200 of the Acts of 2016
S227 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1878 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S287 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S288 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S297 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S1822 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2249 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 200 of the Acts of 2016
S227 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1878 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S287 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S288 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S297 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S270 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S270.pdf |