MA S1689 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2611

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to non-Commonwealth entities within the state employees’ retirement system. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to non-Commonwealth entities within the state employees’ retirement system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2611
2023-03-29JointHearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2583 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2611 (Replaced by) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback