MA S1631 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to police pursuits. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to police pursuits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
S2447 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2021
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H3971 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4838
H3762 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2022
S1654 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
S2447 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2021
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H3971 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4838
H3762 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2022
S1654 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1631 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1631.pdf |