MA H2541 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for motor vehicle operators refusing to stop for a police officer. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to police pursuits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-13SenateSenate concurred
2022-05-19HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-05-16SenateSenate concurred
2022-05-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-03-17SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-09HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-09-30JointHearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1631 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback