MA S1600 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce the income tax. Revenue.
Title
Reducing the income tax
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
Sen. James Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1587 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1732 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1529 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1177 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied S1188
S60 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1527 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1455 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1587 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1732 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1529 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1177 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied S1188
S60 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1527 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1455 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1600 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1600.pdf |