MA S1593 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1970
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1970
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1970
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to credit for thermal energy generated with renewable fuels. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to credit for thermal energy generated with renewable fuels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S1970 |
2013-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1970 (Replaced by) 2014-06-19 - New draft substituted, see S2214
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1593 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1593.pdf |