MA S159 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation protect innovation and entrepreneurship in the Commonwealth. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To protect innovation and entrepreneurship in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2484 |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S154 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
H2727 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H229 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
H873 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
H3632 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2484 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2727 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H229 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
H873 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
H3632 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2484 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S159 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S159.pdf |