MA S154 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to bad faith assertions of patent infringement. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to bad faith assertions of patent infringement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2484 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S159 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
H229 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
S2484 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H229 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2484
S2484 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S154.pdf |