MA S1551 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase membership in the PRIM Board. Public Service.
Title
To increase membership in the PRIM Board
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2937 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1528 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1497 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1576 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1528 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1497 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1576 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1551 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1551.pdf |