MA S1550 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen family and community connection with incarcerated people. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To strengthen family and community connection with incarcerated people
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Accompanied H2440 |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2440 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1593 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
H1663 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1551 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2462 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2460 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1686 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3433 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1593 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
H1663 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1551 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2462 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2460 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1686 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3433 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1550 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1550.pdf |