MA S1542 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure educational rights are upheld for incarcerated emerging adults. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To ensure educational rights are upheld for incarcerated emerging adults
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1493 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H515 (Similar To) 2023-05-30 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H515 (Similar To) 2023-05-30 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1542 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1542.pdf |