MA S1509 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to excessive executive compensation. Revenue.
Title
Relative to excessive executive compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] |
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S875 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S56 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H64 (Similar To) 2015-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015
S768 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S875 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S56 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H64 (Similar To) 2015-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015
S768 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1509 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1509.pdf |