MA S1486 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure timely electronic health record interoperability across health systems to protect patient lives. Public Health.
Title
To protect life-saving electronic health records from reckless corporate greed and corruption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2772 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S628 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S225 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S1435 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2891
S2772 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S628 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S225 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S1435 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2891
S2772 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1486 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1486.pdf |