MA S1484 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2692
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to combat V.I.P. syndrome to protect health care integrity and quality. Public Health.
Title
To combat V.I.P. syndrome to protect health care integrity and quality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2692 |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S802 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S802 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1484.pdf |