MA S1476 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to debarment in public contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to debarment in public contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-02-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1476 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1476.pdf |