MA S147 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to check cashing fees. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to check cashing fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S130 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Report amended by substitution of bill, see S2304
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
H218 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2962 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
H218 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2962 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S147 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S147.pdf |