MA H2962 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit fees imposed on check cashing. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to check cashing schedules
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2018-01-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S147 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S147 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2962 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2962.pdf |