MA S1467 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to taxes due upon the death of active duty personnel and the elderly. Revenue.
Title
Relative to taxes due upon the death of active duty personnel and the elderly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-12-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-12-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-12-03 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1548 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1451 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1465 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1459 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H2587
S1541 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1974
S1466 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1548 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1451 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1465 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1459 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H2587
S1541 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1974
S1466 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1467 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1467.pdf |