MA S1454 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2441
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a municipal gas tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a municipal gas tax exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Fargo [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Sen. James Timilty [D] | Sen. Richard Moore [D] |
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Gale Candaras [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2441 |
2011-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2441 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1454 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8660&generalCourtId=1 |