MA S1441 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to in-state meat inspection programs. Public Health.
Title
Relative to in-state meat inspection programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S3173 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S101 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2214 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S316 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2485 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
H1972 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4604
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2214 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S316 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2485 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
H1972 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4604
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1441 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1441.pdf |