MA S143 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the town of Webster to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Webster to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H290 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H219 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H226 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H289 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S2188 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H291 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback