MA S1429 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2565

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote transparency of facial recognition and driver's license photos. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote transparency of facial recognition and driver's license photos

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2565
2019-10-16JointHearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1385 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred
H3032 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1538 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback