MA H1538 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5148

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for the regulation of face recognition and emerging biometric surveillance technologies. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to unregulated face recognition and emerging biometric surveillance technologies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5148
2020-10-01SenateSenate concurred
2020-08-06HouseReporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-05-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-11HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1385 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S1757 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5148 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback