MA S142 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide municipal control of liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing municipal control of liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2534 |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H306 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S158 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H4048 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4118
H4060 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S158 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H4048 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4118
H4060 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S142 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S142.pdf |