MA S1403 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Accompanied H2298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Accompanied H2298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to establish and implement a Food and Health Pilot Program. Public Health.
Title
Relative to establishing and implementing a Food and Health Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Accompanied H2298 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S298 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied S2532
H715 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see H3999
S363 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2298 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2277 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H715 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see H3999
S363 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2298 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2277 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1403 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1403.pdf |