MA S1400 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize voluntary income tax return contributions to the Massachusetts Fire Fighters Academy Trust Fund. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing voluntary contributions to the Massachusetts Fire Fighters Academy Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1400 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1400.pdf |